Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Maria Pettinari, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Urbino, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Palmyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1818Born
16 Jun 183416.3ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
29 Nov 184022.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
21 Dec 186345.8AppointedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
3 Jan 186445.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
18 Nov 188163.7AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
27 Jul 188567.4ResignedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
27 Jul 188567.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Palmyra
24 May 188668.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Urbino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Pettinari
Archbishop Antonio Maria Pettinari O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Urbino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFano
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Ara Coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 420, and Page 436
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 575
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 May 2017