Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemente Pagliaro

Deceased

Bishop of Anagni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1807Born
19 Dec 182922.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 185750.7AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
3 Jan 185850.7Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni, Italy
9 Mar 187567.9DiedBishop of Anagni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Clemente Pagliaro
Bishop Clemente Pagliaro (born , died ) Bishop of Anagni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAcqualagna, Archdiocese of Urbino
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 98
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1858, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Jan 2017