Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mariano Cardinal Falcinelli Antoniacci, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1806Born
18 Dec 182519.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
13 Jun 182922.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Mar 185346.3AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
17 Apr 185346.4Ordained BishopBishop of Forli, Italy
14 Dec 185751.0AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Brazil
21 Dec 185751.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
14 Aug 186356.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
22 Dec 187367.0Elevated to Cardinal
22 Dec 187367.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
4 May 187467.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
29 May 187467.5DiedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello

MicroData Summary for Mariano Falcinelli Antoniacci (VIAF: 88819861)
Mariano Cardinal Falcinelli Antoniacci O.S.B. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAssisi
Ordained BishopS. Paolo fuori le mura, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Lorenzo, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Cemetery Chapel, Diocese of Assisi, Italy

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
  • a cardinal for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 128, and Page 275
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 49
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 12
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1873
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 47, and Page 48, and Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast