Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre Sola

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1791BornCarmagnole, Italy
21 Jun 181624.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 185766.3SelectedBishop of Nice, France
21 Dec 185766.4ConfirmedBishop of Nice, France
3 Jan 185866.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nice, France
4 Dec 187786.4RetiredBishop of Nice, France
31 Dec 188190.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Nice, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Sola:
Bishop Jean-Pierre Sola (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nice

  • a priest for 65.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 412

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013