Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingos Quirino de Souza

Deceased

Bishop of Goiás, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1813Born
30 Nov 183825.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Dec 183825.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Nov 186047.1SelectedBishop of Goiás, Brazil
18 Mar 186147.4ConfirmedBishop of Goiás, Brazil
1 Dec 186148.1Ordained BishopBishop of Goiás, Brazil
12 Sep 186349.9DiedBishop of Goiás, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Domingos Quirino de Souza (VIAF: 89562329)
Bishop Domingos Quirino de Souza (born , died ) Bishop of Goiás

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEstância
Ordained BishopSao Bento, Rio de Janeiro, Diocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 24.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 288
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jan 2017