Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastião Pinto do Rêgo

Deceased

Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1802Born
13 Jun 182422.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Nov 182523.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 186159.2SelectedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
30 Sep 186159.4AppointedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
18 May 186260.0Ordained BishopBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
10 Jun 186260.1InstalledBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
30 Apr 186866.0DiedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Sebastião Pinto do Rêgo
Bishop Sebastião Pinto do Rêgo (born , died ) Bishop of São Paulo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngra dos Reis, Diocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 444
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017