Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Andrea Cardinal Bizzarri

Deceased

Prefect of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1802Born
18 Dec 182422.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 185452.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
17 Dec 185452.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippi
16 Mar 186360.8Elevated to Cardinal
19 Mar 186360.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
17 Jan 186764.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
31 Aug 187270.3AppointedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other
5 Jul 187573.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
26 Aug 187775.2DiedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Andrea Bizzarri (VIAF: 89733506)
Giuseppe Andrea Cardinal Bizzarri (born , died ) Prefect of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaliano, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Jerome des Esclavons, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
  • a cardinal for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 453, and Page 46
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 48
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 40
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Mar 1863

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017