Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vincenzo Cardinal Moretti

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ravenna

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1815BornOrvieto
22 Sep 183822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Orvieto, Italy
17 Dec 185540.1AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
13 Jan 185640.2Ordained BishopBishop of Comacchio, Italy
23 Mar 186044.4AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
27 Mar 186751.4AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
27 Oct 187156.0AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
28 Dec 187762.1Elevated to Cardinal
31 Dec 187762.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
22 Sep 1879³63.9ResignedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
6 Oct 188165.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ravenna, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Moretti:
Cardinal Vincenzo Moretti (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ravenna

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
  • a cardinal for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 168, and Page 217
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 320, and Page 477
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013