Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Pianori, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Faenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1811Born
27 Dec 183322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
27 Oct 187160.5AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
30 Nov 187160.6Ordained BishopBishop of Faenza, Italy
12 Apr 188472.9DiedBishop of Faenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Pianori (VIAF: 89280930)
Bishop Angelo Pianori O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Faenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrisighella
Ordained BishopCathedral, Imola, Diocese of Imola

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 268
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017