Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Canzi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1804Born
22 Sep 182722.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 186763.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
20 Dec 186763.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
12 Jan 186863.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
28 Jul 187873.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Canzi
Bishop Antonio Canzi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLodi, Diocese of Lodi
Ordained BishopSte Catherine de Sienne, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 236
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017