Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Rossi Vaccari

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1808BornRoma
8 Sep 183122.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 186657.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
1 Jul 186657.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
22 Nov 187465.9DiedTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}

MicroData Summary for Antonio Rossi Vaccari:
Archbishop Antonio Rossi Vaccari (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013