Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Bentini

Deceased

Bishop of Cesena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1802Born
18 Sep 182422.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cesena, Italy
27 Oct 187169.7AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
30 Nov 187169.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena, Italy
30 Nov 188179.8DiedBishop of Cesena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Bentini
Bishop Paolo Bentini (born , died ) Bishop of Cesena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesena, Diocese of Cesena
Ordained BishopCathedral, Imola, Diocese of Imola

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 168
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017