Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Maria Majoli

Deceased

Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1814Born
17 Dec 183622.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 187156.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
6 Mar 187156.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dora
2 Apr 187156.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dora
29 Jul 187258.2AppointedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
19 Jun 189379.0DiedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Majoli (VIAF: 255362466)
Bishop Giovanni Maria Majoli (born , died ) Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRavenna, Archdiocese of Ravenna
Ordained BishopForli, Diocese of Forli

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1894
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 102, and Page 250
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017