Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Paolo Trucchi, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Forli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1807BornTivoli
19 Sep 182922.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
21 Sep 184639.5AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
4 Oct 184639.6Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni, Italy
21 Dec 185750.8AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
21 Jan 188779.8DiedBishop of Forli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Paolo Trucchi:
Bishop Pietro Paolo Trucchi C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Forli

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 98, and Page 275

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013