Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Bonajuti (Bonaiuti)

Deceased

Bishop of Pesaro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1828Born
20 Dec 185123.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 189061.7AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
29 Jun 189061.7Ordained BishopBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
22 Jun 189667.7AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
26 Jul 190475.8DiedBishop of Pesaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Bonajuti (Bonaiuti) (VIAF: 307355933)
Bishop Carlo Bonajuti (Bonaiuti) (born , died ) Bishop of Pesaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastel di Casio, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopSacro Cuore di Villa Lante, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 269, and Page 456
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017