Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Leone Sallua, O.P. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Chalcedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1815Born
28 Jan 183822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
12 Mar 187761.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
22 Apr 187761.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
21 Dec 189681.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Leone Sallua (VIAF: 284012612)
Archbishop Vincenzo Leone Sallua O.P. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Chalcedon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGaressio, Diocese of Mondovi, Italy
Ordained BishopLa Minerve, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 197
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1877, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017