Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Maria Bressi, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Otranto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1838Born
1 Dec 186123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
10 Nov 188445.9AppointedBishop of Bovino, Italy
16 Nov 188445.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
23 May 188748.4AppointedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
23 Jan 189051.1DiedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Maria Bressi
Archbishop Salvatore Maria Bressi O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop of Otranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopAugustins des 7 douleurs-Janicule, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 28.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 155, and Page 311
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017