Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Ingami

Deceased

Bishop of Orvieto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1830Born
18 Sep 185222.7Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 188050.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Albano, Italy
27 Feb 188050.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
14 Mar 188050.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidon
10 Nov 188454.8AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
14 Aug 188959.6DiedBishop of Orvieto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Ingami (VIAF: 89111854)
Bishop Giuseppe Ingami (born , died ) Bishop of Orvieto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarino, Suburbicarian See of Albano
Ordained BishopSt. Mary Major, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 518, and Page 575
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017