Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Giordani

Deceased

Bishop of Alatri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1832Born
23 Dec 185422.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 188250.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
3 Jul 188250.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Areopolis
23 Jul 188250.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Areopolis
10 Mar 188552.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Albano, Italy
25 Nov 188755.5AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
13 Dec 190270.6DiedBishop of Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Giordani (VIAF: 90356014)
Bishop Francesco Giordani (born , died ) Bishop of Alatri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCivita Lavinia, Suburbicarian See of Albano
Ordained BishopCathedral, Albano, Suburbicarian See of Albano

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 84, and Page 119
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017