Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Innocenzo Sannibale

Deceased

Bishop of Gubbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1811BornAlbano
20 Sep 183423.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 185543.7AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
25 Mar 185543.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy
9 Apr 189179.7DiedBishop of Gubbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Innocenzo Sannibale:
Bishop Innocenzo Sannibale (born , died ) Bishop of Gubbio

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013