Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Alessandrini

Deceased

Bishop of Ripatransone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1822Born
21 Dec 184422.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 187149.7AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
19 Nov 187149.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
17 Nov 188159.8DiedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Alessandrini
Bishop Francesco Alessandrini (born , died ) Bishop of Ripatransone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGubbio, Diocese of Gubbio
Ordained BishopGubbio, Diocese of Gubbio

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1878, Page 272
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,329
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 483
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017