Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Andreoli

Deceased

Bishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1806Born
18 Dec 183024.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 186357.5AppointedBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
3 Jan 186457.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
9 May 187568.9DiedBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Andreoli
Bishop Francesco Andreoli (born , died ) Bishop of Cagli e Pergola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassoferrato
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Ara Coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 172
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Jan 2017