Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Berardi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1810Born
16 Apr 185140.5AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
18 Jan 185948.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
31 Oct 186050.0ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
19 Mar 186251.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 186251.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
8 Nov 186353.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
13 Mar 186857.4Elevated to Cardinal
13 Mar 186857.4ResignedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
16 Mar 186857.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
6 Apr 187867.5DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Berardi (VIAF: 41830587)
Giuseppe Cardinal Berardi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCeccano, Diocese of Ferentino, Italy
Ordained BishopGesù, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 16.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
  • a cardinal for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 411, and Page 49
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1863, Number 19
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Mar 1868
  • x933/xsta: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 22, and Page 31, and Page 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast