Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manoel do Rego Medeiros

Deceased

Bishop of Olinda, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1829Born
29 Jun 185323.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 Jul 185323.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 186536.0AppointedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
12 Nov 186536.1Ordained BishopBishop of Olinda, Brazil
16 Sep 186636.9DiedBishop of Olinda, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manoel do Rego Medeiros
Bishop Manoel do Rego Medeiros (born , died ) Bishop of Olinda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAracati
Ordained BishopSte Croix de Jeruslaem, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 13.2 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 424
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018