Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Niccola Cardinal Paracciani Clarelli

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Reverend Fabric of St. Peter

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1799BornRieti
1 Jun 182223.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 184444.7AppointedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
22 Jan 184444.7Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jan 184444.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
11 Feb 184444.8Ordained BishopBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
Jun 1854³55.1ResignedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
10 Oct 186061.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
24 Apr 186364.0AppointedSecretary of the Roman Curia - Other
22 Feb 186767.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
1870²70.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Reverend Fabric of St. Peter
8 Oct 187071.4AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
7 Jul 187273.2DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Reverend Fabric of St. Peter

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccola Paracciani Clarelli (VIAF: 89734399)
Niccola Cardinal Paracciani Clarelli (born , died ) Prefect of Reverend Fabric of St. Peter

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
  • a cardinal for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 45
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 270
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1844, Number 9
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jan 1844

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016