Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anselmo Fauli, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Grosseto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1817Born
21 Nov 184124.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
22 Feb 186749.4AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
24 Mar 186749.5Ordained BishopBishop of Grosseto, Italy
30 Jan 187658.3DiedBishop of Grosseto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Anselmo Fauli
Bishop Anselmo Fauli O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Grosseto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Lucia, Diocese of Pistoia e Prato
Ordained BishopSte Catherine de Sienne au Quirinal, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 292
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Feb 2017