Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Frédéric-François-Xavier Ghislain de Mérode

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Melitene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1820Born
22 Sep 184929.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 186646.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Melitene
1 Jul 186646.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Melitene
11 Jul 187454.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Melitene

MicroData Summary for Frédéric-François-Xavier Ghislain de Mérode (VIAF: 282911629)
Archbishop Frédéric-François-Xavier Ghislain de Mérode (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Melitene

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMechlin, Belgium
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 24.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 377
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017