Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stefano Stefanopoli

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Philippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1834Born
25 Sep 186834.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
8 Nov 186834.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippi
24 Nov 189561.7DiedTitular Archbishop of Philippi

MicroData Summary for Stefano Stefanopoli
Archbishop Stefano Stefanopoli (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Philippi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCargese
Ordained BishopGreek College - St. Athanase, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017