Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Karl August Cardinal von Reisach

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Official of the Roman Curia - Other


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1800BornRoth
10 Aug 182828.1Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
24 Apr 183635.8SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
11 Jul 183636.0ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
17 Jul 183636.0Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
13 Mar 183736.7InstalledBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
12 Jul 184141.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
1 Oct 184646.2SucceededArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
25 Jan 184746.6InstalledArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
17 Dec 185555.4Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 185555.4AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
20 Dec 185555.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
19 Jun 185656.0ResignedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
27 Sep 186161.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
22 Jun 186868.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
22 Dec 186969.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl August von Reisach:
Cardinal Karl August von Reisach (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
  • a cardinal for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 45, and Page 46
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 47
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 191, and Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014