Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Victor-Auguste-Isidore Cardinal Dechamps, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Mechelen, Belgium

Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1810Born
20 Dec 183424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mechelen, Belgium
13 Jun 183625.5ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
25 Sep 186554.8AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
1 Oct 186554.8Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
20 Dec 186757.0AppointedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
15 Mar 187564.2Elevated to Cardinal
31 Mar 187564.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
29 Sep 188372.8DiedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Victor-Auguste-Isidore Dechamps (VIAF: 89587707)
Victor-Auguste-Isidore Cardinal Dechamps C.SS.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Mechelen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelle, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}
Ordained PriestMechelen, Archdiocese of Mechelen
Ordained BishopS. Alfonso Maria de Ligorio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceMechelen, Archdiocese of Mechelen
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Rumilliers
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Crypt, Mechelen, Archdiocese of Mechelen

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
  • a cardinal for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 374, and Page 400
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 47
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c1+: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 33
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1875

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Feb 2017