Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidore-Joseph du Rousseaux

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1826Born
8 Sep 184923.6Ordained PriestPriest of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
22 Nov 187953.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
27 Feb 188054.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Eumenia
14 Mar 188054.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eumenia
12 Nov 188054.8AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
23 Sep 189771.6DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Isidore-Joseph du Rousseaux
Bishop Isidore-Joseph du Rousseaux (born , died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHall
Ordained BishopChapel of the Little Seminary, Malines, Archdiocese of Mechelen

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 265, and Page 559
  • c2+: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017