Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emile Joseph Pourbaix

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Eudocias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1845Born
4 Jun 187126.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
19 Jan 189347.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
19 Jan 189347.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Eudocias
2 Feb 189347.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eudocias
8 Jun 189449.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Emile Joseph Pourbaix (VIAF: 89365758)
Bishop Emile Joseph Pourbaix (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrazegnies, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}
Ordained BishopGrand Seminary, Tournai, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}
Death PlaceTournai, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a priest for 23.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 264
  • ob/c2+: MW, 20 Jan 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017