Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Decrolière

Deceased

Bishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1839Born
26 May 186627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
11 Jul 189253.2AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
1 Aug 189253.3Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
5 Sep 189960.4DiedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Decrolière
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Decrolière (born , died ) Bishop of Namur {Namen}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarchienne-au-Pont, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}
Ordained BishopSt. Aubain, Namur, Diocese of Namur {Namen}

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 401
  • ob/c2+: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jun 2017