Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Gustave Walravens

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1841Born
1 Apr 186523.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
10 Jun 186523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
28 Jan 189755.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
28 Jan 189755.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Samosata
24 Feb 189755.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samosata
16 Dec 189756.4AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
19 Feb 191573.6DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Charles-Gustave Walravens
Bishop Charles-Gustave Walravens (born , died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEnghien
Ordained BishopTournai, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}
Death PlaceTournai, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 498, and Page 559
  • c1+: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast