Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustave-Joseph Waffelaert

Deceased

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1847Born
17 Dec 187023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
28 Jun 189547.8AppointedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
25 Jul 189547.9Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
18 Dec 193184.3DiedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Gustave-Joseph Waffelaert (VIAF: 14764321)
Bishop Gustave-Joseph Waffelaert (born , died ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRolleghem, Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}
Ordained BishopS. Sauveur, Cathedral, Bruges, Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 159
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 93
  • c1+: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017