Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre-Lambert Cardinal Goossens

Deceased

Archbishop of Mechelen

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1827BornPerk
21 Dec 185023.4Ordained PriestPriest of Mechelen, Belgium
1 Jun 188355.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
1 Jun 188355.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Abdera
24 Jun 188355.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abdera
16 Jul 188356.0SucceededBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
24 Mar 188456.7AppointedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
24 May 188961.8Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 188961.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
25 Jan 190678.5DiedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Lambert Goossens:
Cardinal Pierre-Lambert Goossens (born , died ) Archbishop of Mechelen

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
  • a cardinal for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 69, and Page 374
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 401, and Page 48
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1889

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014