Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor-Joseph Doutreloux

Deceased

Bishop of Liège, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1837Born
23 Feb 186123.7Ordained PriestPriest of Liège, Belgium
5 Jul 187538.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Liège, Belgium
5 Jul 187538.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
1 Aug 187538.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Geras
24 Aug 187942.2SucceededBishop of Liège, Belgium
24 Aug 190164.2DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Victor-Joseph Doutreloux (VIAF: 192291860)
Bishop Victor-Joseph Doutreloux (born , died ) Bishop of Liège

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChênée
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Cathedral, Liège, Diocese of Liège

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 284, and Page 338
  • c2+: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017