Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Théodore Alexis Joseph de Montpellier

Deceased

Bishop of Liège, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1807Born
7 Sep 183326.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 185245.3AppointedBishop of Liège, Belgium
7 Nov 185245.4Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium
24 Aug 187972.2DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Théodore Alexis Joseph de Montpellier (VIAF: 89259218)
Bishop Théodore Alexis Joseph de Montpellier (born , died ) Bishop of Liège

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVedrin, Diocese of Namur {Namen}
Ordained BishopS. Paul Cathedral, Liège, Diocese of Liège

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 338
  • c1+: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Feb 2017