Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptist Malou

Deceased

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1809BornYpres
2 Nov 183425.3Ordained PriestPriest of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
11 Dec 184839.4AppointedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
1 May 184939.8Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
23 Mar 186454.7DiedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptist Malou (VIAF: 79109779)
Bishop Jean-Baptist Malou (born , died ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a priest for 29.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 159
  • c1+: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Dec 2016