Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Walter Herman Jacobus Steins, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Auckland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1810BornAmsterdam, Netherlands
8 Sep 184232.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
18 Dec 186050.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bombay, India
18 Dec 186050.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
29 Jun 186151.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
11 Jan 186756.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Bengal, India
11 Jan 186756.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bostra
Dec 1877²67.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Western Bengal, India
23 Apr 187968.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Auckland, New Zealand
7 Sep 188171.2DiedBishop of Auckland, New Zealand

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Walter Herman Jacobus Steins:
Archbishop Walter Herman Jacobus Steins S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Auckland

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 130, and Page 154
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 415

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014