Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph van Reeth, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Galle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1843BornAnvers, Belgium
25 Sep 186017.1ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
8 Sep 187532.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
11 Jan 189551.4AppointedBishop of Galle, Sri Lanka
19 Mar 189551.6Ordained BishopBishop of Galle, Sri Lanka
11 Sep 192380.1DiedBishop of Galle, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Joseph van Reeth:
Bishop Joseph van Reeth S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Galle

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 280
  • c1+: Google Books

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014