Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Engelbert Cardinal Sterckx

Deceased

Archbishop of Mechelen

Cardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1792BornOphem
18 Feb 181522.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mechelen, Belgium
24 Feb 183239.3AppointedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
8 Apr 183239.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
13 Sep 183845.9Elevated to Cardinal
17 Sep 183845.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
4 Dec 186775.1DiedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Engelbert Sterckx:
Cardinal Engelbert Sterckx (born , died ) Archbishop of Mechelen

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
  • a cardinal for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 259
  • c1: Google Books

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014