Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Theophiel (Théophile) Verbist, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Pro-Vicar Apostolic of Mongolia, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1823Born
18 Sep 184724.2Ordained PriestPriest
1862²38.5EnteredPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
1866²42.5AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Mongolia, China
23 Feb 186844.6DiedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Mongolia, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Theophiel (Théophile) Verbist (VIAF: 67390568)
Father Theophiel (Théophile) Verbist C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Pro-Vicar Apostolic of Mongolia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAntwerp, Archdiocese of Mechelen, Belgium
Death PlaceLaohugou

  • a priest for 20.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast