Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Frans (Jean-François) Van de Velde

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1779BornBoom
8 Aug 180222.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 182949.6AppointedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
8 Nov 182950.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
7 Aug 183858.9DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jan Frans (Jean-François) Van de Velde (VIAF: 287283774)
Bishop Jan Frans (Jean-François) Van de Velde (born , died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 202
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Jul 2016