Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Hermann Koeckemann, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands, USA

Titular Bishop of Olba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1828Born
11 Apr 185123.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
31 May 186234.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
17 May 188153.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands, USA
17 May 188153.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Olba
21 Aug 188153.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olba
11 Jun 188254.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands, USA
22 Feb 189264.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands, USA

MicroData Summary for Bernard Hermann Koeckemann
Bishop Bernard Hermann Koeckemann SS.CC. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOstbevern, Diocese of MŘnster, Germany
Ordained BishopSte Marie, Cathedral, San Francisco, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 423
  • bp/prof: CB, 10 Mar 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1881, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017