Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lodewijk-Jozef Delebecque

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1798BornWarnèton-sud
24 May 182223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mechelen, Belgium
13 Sep 183839.8AppointedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
4 Nov 183839.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
2 Oct 186465.8DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Lodewijk-Jozef Delebecque:
Bishop Lodewijk-Jozef Delebecque (born , died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1861
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 202
  • c1+: Google Books

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014