Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raffaele Cardinal Fornari

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Studies

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1787Born
4 Dec 183851.8AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Belgium
24 Jan 184255.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
25 Jan 184255.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
3 Apr 184255.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
12 Dec 184255.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
21 Dec 184659.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
30 Sep 185063.6Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 185063.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
10 Apr 185164.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
7 Jun 185164.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies
15 Jun 185467.3DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Fornari (VIAF: 196413203)
Raffaele Cardinal Fornari (born , died ) Prefect of Studies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Rombaud, Cathedral, Mechelen, Archdiocese of Mechelen, Belgium
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria sopra Minerva, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
  • a cardinal for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 50
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 282
  • c2+: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 16
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 61, and Page 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast