Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas-Joseph Dehesselle

Deceased

Bishop of Namur {Namen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1789BornCharneux
21 Jun 181223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
1 Feb 183646.6AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
13 Mar 183646.7Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
15 Aug 186576.1DiedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Nicolas-Joseph Dehesselle:
Bishop Nicolas-Joseph Dehesselle (born , died ) Bishop of Namur {Namen}

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 275
  • ob/c2+: Google Books

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014