Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Jacques Nanquette

Deceased

Bishop of Le Mans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1807Born
18 Dec 183023.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 185547.7SelectedBishop of Le Mans, France
28 Sep 185547.8ConfirmedBishop of Le Mans, France
11 Nov 185547.9Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France
19 Nov 186153.9DiedBishop of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Jacques Nanquette (VIAF: 316450174)
Bishop Jean-Jacques Nanquette (born , died ) Bishop of Le Mans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFumay, Diocese of Metz
Ordained BishopCathedral, Reims, Archdiocese of Reims

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 195
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017