Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Jean Fillion

Deceased

Bishop of Le Mans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1817Born
19 Sep 184023.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 185840.7SelectedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
15 Mar 185840.8ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
16 May 185841.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Claude, France
3 Jun 185841.0InstalledBishop of Saint-Claude, France
25 Jan 186244.7SelectedBishop of Le Mans, France
7 Apr 186244.9ConfirmedBishop of Le Mans, France
3 Jun 186245.0InstalledBishop of Le Mans, France
28 Jul 187457.2DiedBishop of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Jean Fillion (VIAF: 36909466)
Bishop Charles-Jean Fillion (born , died ) Bishop of Le Mans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Denis d'Anjou
Ordained BishopCathedral, Le Mans, Diocese of Le Mans

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 195, and Page 208
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017